FL H0453 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to procure certain types of insurance for their officers & employees through interlocal agreements; provides exception; requires each school district to enter into interlocal agreement & establish School District Insurance Consortium governed by board of directors; provides for membership & specifies terms of office for board members; requires DMS to provide technical services to consortium; requires consortium to advertise for competitive bids for insurance; requires school districts to engage in collective bargaining with certified bargaining agents.
Title
Group Insurance for Public Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 45 | |
2011-12-08 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 177 | |
2011-12-08 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 177 | |
2011-12-01 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 12/08/11, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to State Affairs Committee; Health and Human Services Committee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee -HJ 45 | |
2011-10-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/453 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0453/BillText/Filed/HTML |