FL H0455 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires use of specified factors in calculating alimony pendente lite; provides presumptions concerning alimony awards depending on duration of marriages; provides for imputation of income in certain circumstances; declares public policy concerning child's interests regarding time sharing in custody & support proceedings; prohibits court from changing duration of alimony award; provides for motions to advance trial of certain actions if specified period has passed since initial service on respondent.
Title
Alimony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Laid on Table |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 668 (Vetoed by Governor) |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-02-08 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-04 | House | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3 |
2016-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-18 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-11-18 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/18/15, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-10-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |