FL H0469 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 276 -HJ 1116
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 276 -HJ 1116
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Florida Veterans' Hall of Fame Council within DVA; provides for membership, terms of members, & organization of council; revises provisions relating to nomination of persons to Florida Veterans' Hall of Fame; provides for annual acceptance of nominations by council; authorizes council to establish criteria for such nominations; designates August 7 of each year as "Purple Heart Day."
Title
Recognition of Military Personnel and Veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Burgin [R] | Rep. Richard Corcoran [R] | Rep. Chris Dorworth [R] | Rep. Larry Metz [R] |
Rep. Jimmie Smith [R] | House State Affairs Committee | Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 276 -HJ 1116 | |
2012-03-06 | Substituted SB 276 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/12 | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 577 | |
2012-02-09 | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 568 | |
2012-02-09 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-08 | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 572 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-31 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 320 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 320 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 47 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 47 | |
2011-10-24 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
265 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
683 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |