FL H0525 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires railroad company operating high-speed passenger rail system to be responsible for certain maintenance, improvement, & upgrade costs; specifies that governmental entity is not responsible for such costs unless it consents in writing.
Title
High-Speed Passenger Rail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-11-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S572 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
341 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/525 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/525/BillText/Filed/PDF |