FL H0531 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to provide that specific appropriation originating from General Revenue Fund, upon veto by Governor, shall be transferred to Budget Stabilization Fund, to specify that amount transferred may not be used in calculating fund's principal balance limitation, & to provide that, if veto is overridden, amount transferred shall be returned to General Revenue Fund for expenditure.
Title
Transfer of Vetoed Appropriations to the Budget Stabilization Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Dane Eagle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-11-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0078 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/531 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0531/BillText/Filed/PDF |