FL H0555 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires determination of specified number of jurors, rather than unanimity, for sentencing recommendation of death; requires court to impose recommended sentence of life imprisonment without possibility of parole if fewer than 8 jurors recommend death; authorizes court to impose life imprisonment without possibility of parole or sentence of death if at least 8 jurors recommend sentence of death; requires court to include in its written order reasons for not accepting jury's recommended sentence, if applicable.
Title
Sentencing Proceedings in Death Penalty Cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23) |
2023-04-13 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 450 |
2023-04-10 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2023) |
2023-04-03 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-03-31 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-31 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-03-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-10 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-08 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-03 | House | PCS added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-07 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S450 (Same As) 2023-04-20 - Chapter No. 2023-23
H609 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
S520 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
H609 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
S520 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 450 (Ch. 2023-23)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
921 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |