FL H0565 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to ex parte communications; requires that communications between commissioner or commission staff & representative of utility be made available to public & advance notice be provided to Public Counsel; prohibits former commissioners & employees of PSC from lobbying legislative or executive branch of state government for 2 years after termination of service or employment & provides applicability, etc.
Title
Public Service Commission
Sponsors
Sen. John Legg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council -HJ 00053; On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall --Workshopped | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall --Workshop | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; General Government Policy Council | |
2010-01-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1034 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In returning messages; Died in returning Messages
H7209 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
H7209 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0350 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0350 | 0605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0364 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0366 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0367 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0368 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |