FL H0571 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for DHSMV to electronically notify parent or guardian when certain events are added to driving record of minor licensed to drive.
Title
Teenage Drivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 58 | |
2011-11-15 | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 58 | |
2011-11-04 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/571 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0571/BillText/Filed/HTML |