FL H0577 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises spaceport territory to include certain property.
Title
Spaceport Territory
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Philip Griffitts [R] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Rep. Kevin Chambliss [D] |
Rep. Alina Garcia [R] | Rep. Jim Mooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-12 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-01-31 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-17 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-12 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-30 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-11-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S968 (Similar To) 2024-04-12 - Chapter No. 2024-76