FL H0585 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemptions from public records & meetings requirements for certain information or victim's identity obtained by elder abuse fatality review team; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statements of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Elder Abuse Fatality Review Teams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H583 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S454 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S452 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
S454 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S452 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/585 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/585/BillText/Filed/PDF |