FL H0607 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines terms "information technology" & "state agency"; revises definition of term "responsible public entity"; revises legislative findings to recognize public need of pursuing information technology projects through establishment of public-private partnerships.
Title
Public-private Partnerships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0609 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
S0332 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
S0322 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
S0332 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
S0322 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/607 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0607/BillText/Filed/PDF |