FL H0607 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from excise tax on documents certain notes & mortgages that are part of loan made by or on behalf of housing financing authority.
Title
Housing Finance Authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-17 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-16 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, 12 HOB |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S730 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
S620 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7087
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
S620 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7087