FL H0609 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 488; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 488 (Ch. 2010-186) -HJ 01170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 488; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 488 (Ch. 2010-186) -HJ 01170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle registration application forms to provide for voluntary contribution to Florida Network of Children's Advocacy Centers, Inc.; provides for use of such funds.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration Application Forms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 488; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 488 (Ch. 2010-186) -HJ 01170 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00939 | |
2010-04-17 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00761 | |
2010-04-16 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00761 | |
2010-04-15 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-04 | Favorable by Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00218; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00218 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00056; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00169; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00169; On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 03/04/10, 8:30 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-02-17 | Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) | |
2010-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0488 (Similar To) 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-186