FL H0615 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-218

Summary

Permits state attorney to request sentencing court to reduce or suspend sentence of convicted felon who provides substantial assistance in identification, arrest, or conviction of any accomplice, accessory, coconspirator, or principal of that felon or another felon; provides that arresting agency be given opportunity to be heard in aggravation or mitigation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substantial Assistance [SPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-07 Chapter No. 2010-218
2010-06-04 Approved by Governor
2010-05-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-29 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01284
2010-04-29 Read 3rd time -SJ 01076; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 01077
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00956; Substituted for CS/SB 874 -SJ 00956; Read 2nd time -SJ 00956
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -SJ 00866; Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00866
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01049; CS passed; YEAS 109 NAYS 1 -HJ 01049
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00914
2010-04-06 Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00610; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00610
2010-04-02 On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/06/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00056; On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/02/10, 8:00 am, 404-H; CS by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00167; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00162; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Original reference(s) removed: Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00163; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00163
2010-02-09 Original reference(s) removed: Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2010-02-03 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-02-02 CS by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2010-01-26 On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/02/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-01-20 Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2010-01-08 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0874 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00956; Substituted CS/HB 615 -SJ 00956; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 615 (Ch. 2010-218) -SJ 00956

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0921186Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback