FL H0625 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that voter information card contain address of polling place of voter; requires supervisor of elections to issue new voter information card upon voter's change of address of legal residence or upon change in voter's polling place address; provides instructions for implementation by supervisors of elections.
Title
Voter Information Cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-29 | Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) -HJ 00424 | |
2010-03-26 | CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00402; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-24 | CS by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00408 | |
2010-03-22 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/24/10, 8:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00057; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 8:00 am, 306-H --Temporarily deferred | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 8:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0192 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Governmental Operations