FL H0625 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SM 658 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SM 658 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes application to Congress to call convention for sole purpose of proposing amendment to U.S. Constitution that requires balanced federal budget.
Title
Balanced Federal Budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SM 658 (Adopted) |
2014-04-21 | House | Substituted SM 658 |
2014-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/14 |
2014-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 9 |
2014-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/01/14, 2:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 3 |
2014-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/20/14, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0658 (Similar To) 2014-05-09 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/625 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0625/BillText/Filed/PDF |