FL H0651 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-132, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 908 (Ch. 2016-165)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-132, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 908 (Ch. 2016-165)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the department to create an Internet-based transmission system to accept service of process; extending the repeal date of an exemption for medical malpractice insurance premiums from certain emergency assessments levied by the Office of Insurance Regulation for the Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund; authorizing service of process by specified means; establishing the Firefighter Assistance Program for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
House Regulatory Affairs Committee | House Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Halsey Beshears [R] |
Rep. Alan Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#844 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#687 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#687 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Chapter No. 2016-132, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 908 (Ch. 2016-165) | |
2016-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-09 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2016-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Concurred in 3 amendment(s) (145740, 411956, 481068) |
2016-03-09 | House | Was taken up |
2016-03-07 | House | In returning messages |
2016-03-07 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, withdrawn (690366) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (145740, 411956, 481068, 690366) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 992 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment temporarily postponed (579575) |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (485855, 757297) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | CS/CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 02/17/16, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-02-11 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-08 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/08/16, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-27 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-26 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-19 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0593 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 479 (Ch. 2016-22), CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), HB 7071 (Ch. 2016-151)
S0686 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 479 (Ch. 2016-22), CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), HB 7071 (Ch. 2016-151)
S0992 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132), SB 908 (Ch. 2016-165)
H0879 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 908 (Ch. 2016-165), CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132)
S0908 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Chapter No. 2016-165, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132)
S0686 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 479 (Ch. 2016-22), CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), HB 7071 (Ch. 2016-151)
S0992 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132), SB 908 (Ch. 2016-165)
H0879 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 908 (Ch. 2016-165), CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132)
S0908 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Chapter No. 2016-165, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 1315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
137 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
374 | 983 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 916 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9892 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0645 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 426 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |