FL H0727 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 976 (Ch. 2021-181)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 976 (Ch. 2021-181)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DEP to encourage certain activities in support of Florida Wildlife Corridor & take specified actions; requires St. Johns River Water Management District, in consultation with Seminole County, DEP, FWCC, & DOT, to issue report by specified date that includes information & updates regarding implementation of specified management plan recommendations; requires certain enforcement actions to be taken for violations of permit conditions.
Title
Wildlife Corridors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 976 (Ch. 2021-181) |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-04-02 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-01 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-10 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-09 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S976 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-181