FL H0737 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for reclassification of theft offenses of specified amounts from nonprofit organizations; requires restitution & community service for certain violations.
Title
Theft from Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S732 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/737 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/737/BillText/Filed/PDF |