FL H0755 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises method of appointment for Secretary of Corrections; creates Florida Corrections Commission; revises definition of "victim injury" by removing prohibition on assessing certain victim injury sentence points for sexual misconduct by an employee of DOC or private correctional facility; expands DOC's security review committee functions; revises provisions relating to use of force; revises reporting requirements; requires DOC to measure recidivism; revises provisions relating to trust funds; prohibits purchase of weight-training equipment; requires DOC to consider needs of inmates over 50 years of age; allows inmate & others to hire & pay for an independent medical evaluation; specifies purpose for outside evaluations; expands eligibility for conditional medical release.
Title
Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0757 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S0930 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S0932 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S7066 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S7006 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S0930 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S0932 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S7066 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S7006 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 8041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 21501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 2151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 6031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 6033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 6034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 6039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/755 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0755/BillText/Filed/PDF |