FL H0773 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that fact that certain electric utilities must provide medically essential electric service does not require them to otherwise be regulated by PSC; provides notification requirements for electric utilities relating to certification process for obtaining medically essential electric service & service disconnection; provides certification requirements for customers; specifies duties of electric utilities; revises penalties for falsification of such certification; requires certain health care practitioners to inform certain patients of such certification process; requires such practitioners to provide patients with completed medical certifications & document certification.
Title
Medically Essential Electric Utility Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#452 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations |
2020-02-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/30/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Webster Hall |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-25 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
366 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |