FL H0777 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases offense severity ranking for failing to register securities with OFR; specifies offense severity ranking for failure of dealer, associated person, or issuer of securities to register with OFR.
Title
Criminal Penalties for Violations of Securities Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1058 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1058 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1713 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1156 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 1156 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 847 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | Passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 1076 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1076 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1020 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 814 | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 814 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/22/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, 404 HOB --Not considered | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 282 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 282 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/24/12, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-12 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 219 | |
2012-01-12 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 219 | |
2012-01-10 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/12/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 77 | |
2011-12-12 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 77 | |
2011-11-28 | Filed |