FL H0795 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain unlawful employment practices against specified employees & job applicants; requires employer to provide written notice of certain rights to employees & post such notice in conspicuous places on its premises; requires Commission on Human Relations to develop certain education & outreach programs.
Title
Pregnant Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Melony Bell [R] | Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] |
Rep. Joy Goff-Marcil [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-26 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/795 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/795/BillText/Filed/PDF |