FL H0815 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions concerning books, records, & other materials of Supreme Court & DCAs; revises provisions concerning filing of decisions of Supreme Court & DCAs & their judges; transfers headquarters of 2d Appellate District; removes requirement that clerk of DCA keep records at headquarters office; requires such clerk to have office at headquarters.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-13 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-11-30 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |