FL H0833 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires district school board to provide students in certain grades with certain amount of free-play recess per day; provides that free-play recess may not be withheld for specified reasons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Recess

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#576 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Education Pre-K - 12
2016-02-23SenateReceived
2016-02-23SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2016-02-23SenateIn Messages
2016-02-18HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
2016-02-18HouseRead 3rd time
2016-02-17HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-02-17HouseRead 2nd time
2016-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/16
2016-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-09HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2016-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/09/16, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2016-02-03HouseNow in Education Committee
2016-02-02HouseFavorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2016-01-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2016-01-26HouseNow in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2016-01-26HouseFavorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2016-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-12-10HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2015-12-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1002 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003455Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback