FL H0859 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes students enrolled in virtual instruction or attending public school that does not offer particular extracurricular activity to participate in that extracurricular activity at public or private school, subject to certain requirements; deletes criterion for students who are enrolled in non-FHSAA member private schools to participate in interscholastic or intrascholastic sports.
Title
Extracurricular Activities
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Adkins [R] | Rep. Daniel Davis [R] | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
House Choice and Innovation Subcommittee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Rep. Ron Saunders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2013-04-04 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/04/13, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-25 | House | CS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-25 | House | Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-20 | House | CS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Choice and Innovation Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 1:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0956 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |