FL H0867 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises dates on which municipal candidates must file qualification papers & fees for certain elections.
Title
Broward County
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-28 | Received -SJ 575 | |
2011-04-27 | In Messages | |
2011-04-27 | Read 2nd time -HJ 820 | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 590 | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-31 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 399 | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 399 | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/29/11, 12:00 pm, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-22 | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee -HJ 274 | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 273 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/21/11, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 74 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 74 | |
2011-02-21 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/867 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0867/BillText/Filed/HTML |