FL H0899 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Chapter No. 2022-126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Chapter No. 2022-126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises data DCF is required to analyze when creating its annual report on initiation of involuntary examinations; requires charter schools to be in compliance with involuntary reporting laws; requires DOE to share certain data with DCF; requires district school boards to designate mental health coordinator; revises requirements for plans relating to mental health assistance allocations.
Title
Mental Health of Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#681 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#681 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Chapter No. 2022-126 | |
2022-05-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1240 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-23 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2022-02-01 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-01-26 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-03 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-03 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-03 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-03 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1240 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 899
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |