FL H0907 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to measurement of student learning growth for purposes of evaluating classroom & nonclassroom instructional personnel; prohibits employee from being penalized for unsatisfactory performance based on certain student learning growth data.
Title
School Personnel Performance Evaluation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in K-12 Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1336 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/907 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0907/BillText/Filed/PDF |