FL H0939 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain items used to manufacture, produce, or modify aircraft engines & gas turbine engines & parts from tax on sales, use, & other transactions.
Title
Exemptions from the Tax on Sales, Use, & Other Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Finance and Tax Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch. | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 525 | |
2012-02-02 | CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 447 | |
2012-02-02 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 456 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 91 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 91 | |
2011-12-07 | Filed |