FL H0943 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises exemptions from background screening requirements for certain mental health personnel & law enforcement officers; eliminates rule that requires AHCA to stagger rescreening schedules; revises provisions relating to background screening for persons rendering care in consumer-directed care program; revises provisions relating to general vocational rehabilitation programs; requires registration of service providers; requires background screening & rescreening of certain persons having contact with vulnerable persons; provides exemptions; provides disqualifying offenses; provides that cost of screening shall be borne by provider or person being screened; provides conditions for denial, suspension, termination, or revocation of registration or other agreements; provides for notice; provides applicability; includes person who has access to client's personal identification information within definition of term "direct service provider"; exempts certain professionals licensed by DOH, attorneys in good standing, relatives of clients, & certain volunteers from level 2 background screening; exempts certain licensed professionals & persons from further screening; provides requirements for screening of direct service providers; requires vendors who submit fingerprints on behalf of employers to meet specified criteria; authorizes employer to hire employee to position that otherwise requires background screening before completion of screening process for purpose of training employee; prohibits employee from having direct contact with vulnerable persons until screening process is complete; creates Care Provider Background Screening Clearinghouse under AHCA, in consultation with FDLE; provides for specified agencies to share results of criminal history checks; provides exemption for certain employees who have undergone criminal history check before clearinghouse is operational; requires application for initial licensure in profession regulated by DOH to include fingerprints submitted by approved vendor after specified date; requires applicant to pay costs of fingerprint processing; provides procedures for submission of fingerprints by private vendors, private entities, & public agencies; specifies standards for electronic submission of fingerprints.
Title
Background Screening
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#864 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#864 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178 | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 911 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 910 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 880 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 822 | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 822 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 772 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 771 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 723 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 682 | |
2012-02-17 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-16 | CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 684 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/16/12, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 318 | |
2012-01-30 | CS/CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 305 | |
2012-01-30 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-25 | CS/CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 310 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/25/12, 11:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-20 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee -HJ 247 | |
2012-01-19 | CS by Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 233 | |
2012-01-19 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 238 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 92 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 92 | |
2011-12-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 4572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1757 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 0402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |