FL H0961 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that after specified time, title insurer must pay claim or cover insured's costs until claim is cured; provides applicability.
Title
Title Insurance Claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 94 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 94 | |
2011-12-08 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/961 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0961/BillText/Filed/HTML |