FL H0963 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that supervisor of elections may designate additional early voting sites in certain areas.
Title
Early Voting Sites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-12-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S780 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/963 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/963/BillText/Filed/PDF |