FL H0991 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds certain residential property to boundaries; revises procedures for final adoption of budget & millage; requires referendum.
Title
Downtown Development Authority of City of Fort Lauderdale, Broward County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-25 | House | CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |