FL H0999 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3-2)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1263 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes legislative intent; defines "bedroom"; provides for any permit issued & approved by DOH for installation, modification, or repair of system to transfer with title of property; prohibits governmental entities from requiring certain inspections & systems; provides circumstances in which system is not considered abandoned; provides for validity of system permit if rules change before final approval of constructed system; provides that system modification, replacement, or upgrade is not required unless bedroom is added to single-family home; deletes provisions requiring system evaluation & assessment program; authorizes counties & municipalities to adopt system evaluation & assessment program; provides criteria, procedures, & requirements for system evaluation & assessment program; defines "system failure"; provides requirements for county health departments; requires DEP & DOH to provide certain information, guidance, & assistance; prohibits adoption of certain rules by DOH; repeals grant program for repair of systems; lowers fees imposed for certain permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Onsite Sewage Treatment and Disposal Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1263 (Ch.
2012-03-05 Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 849
2012-03-05 Received -SJ 849
2012-02-29 In Messages
2012-02-29 CS passed as amended; YEAS 105 NAYS 11 -HJ 940
2012-02-29 Read 3rd time -HJ 939
2012-02-28 Placed on 3rd reading
2012-02-28 Read 2nd time -HJ 891
2012-02-24 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12
2012-02-23 CS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 801
2012-02-23 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-02-22 CS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 -HJ 815
2012-02-20 On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/22/12, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2012-02-17 Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 682
2012-02-17 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-02-16 CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time -HJ 662
2012-02-16 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-02-15 CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -HJ 670
2012-02-13 On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/15/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2012-01-31 Now in Appropriations Committee -HJ 318
2012-01-30 CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 306
2012-01-30 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-01-19 CS by Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 310
2012-01-17 On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 01/19/12, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 97
2011-12-28 Referred to Economic Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 98
2011-12-12 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810066Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback