FL H1035 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2016-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2016-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates State Technology Security Incident Trust Fund within AST; provides for purpose & source of funds of trust fund; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund; provides for contingent effect.
Title
Trust Funds/Creation/State Technology Security Incident Trust Fund/Agency for State Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2016-138) |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-12-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1033 (Related) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 624 (Ch. 2016-114)
S7050 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2016-138), CS/SB 624 (Ch. 2016-114)
S7050 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2016-138), CS/SB 624 (Ch. 2016-114)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1035 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1035/BillText/Filed/PDF |