FL H1045 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes contracts for school bus infraction detection systems which authorize private vendor or manufacturer to receive share of revenue; revises requirements for signage posted on rear of school bus; requires law enforcement to send notice of violation to registered owner of motor vehicle involved in violation; requires court to determine whether violation has occurred; requires court to uphold violation if violation has occurred and require petitioner to pay penalties & costs; revises required uses for civil penalties assessed & collected for violations; prohibits use of system for remote surveillance; revises purposes for which video & images may be used; requires that civil penalties be remitted to school district.
Title
Student Transportation Safety
Sponsors
House Infrastructure Strategies Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Kiyan Michael [R] | Rep. Kimberly Berfield [R] |
Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Linda Chaney [R] | Rep. Mike Redondo [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-27 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-26 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-26 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | PCS added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda |
2024-02-02 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S994 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
S7002 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H7039 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7002
S7002 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H7039 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7002
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |