FL H1049 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires seller of residential real property to provide specified information to a prospective purchaser; specifies how such information must be disclosed.
Title
Flood Disclosure in the Sale of Real Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#47 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#812 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#812 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 484 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024) |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Original reference removed: Commerce Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-02-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-07 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Original reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-06 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S484 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1049