FL H1059 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides conditions under which neighborhood improvement district may borrow money contract loans, & issue bonds, certificates, warrants, notes, or other evidence of indebtedness & may pledge special assessment power of district to pay such debts for purpose of financing certain capital projects.
Title
City of Lauderhill, Broward County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-12-29 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1059 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1059/BillText/Filed/PDF |