FL H1073 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on December 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 292
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 292
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospitals & other state-licensed birthing facilities to test for congenital cytomegalovirus in newborns; revises timeframe for health care providers attending home births to make referrals; provides that primary health care providers are responsible for coordinating referrals under certain circumstances; requires providers to test newborns for congenital cytomegalovirus; revises timeframe for hospitals to complete newborn hearing screenings; requires test results be reported to DOH.
Title
Newborn Screenings
Sponsors
House Professions and Public Health Subcommittee | Rep. Vance Aloupis [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] |
Rep. Jim Mooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 292 |
2022-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2022-02-14 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-12-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S292 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-25