FL H1089 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the date after which certain structures cease to be eligible for coverage by the corporation; providing that a condominium is deemed ineligible for commercial residential wind-only coverage under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#727 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#727 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-140 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 24 NAYS 6 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1274 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (294697) |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-15 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-10 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/10/14, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-28 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | CS referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-27 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-25 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/25/14, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1274 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1089 (Ch. 2014-140)
S1672 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-104
S1672 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-104
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |