FL H1257 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises powers of board of commissioners relating to employment of certain persons; specifies provisions of law governing election of commissioners & removes obsolete provisions for staggering of initial terms; requires district to pay for surety bonds required of commissioners prior to their assuming office, etc.
Title
Indian River Mosquito Control District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00205 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00113 | |
2010-02-24 | Filed |