FL H1269 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies authorized potency of tetrahydrocannabinol when consuming marijuana for personal use; prohibits edibles for personal use from containing more than specified amount of tetrahydrocannabinol or from having potency variance greater than specified percentage; prohibits container for marijuana products prepackaged for use in vapor-generating electronic device from exceeding specified size; abrogates contingent future repeal of specified provisions.
Title
Potency for Adult Personal Use of Marijuana
Sponsors
House Health & Human Services Committee | House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] | Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-19 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-02-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-05 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7050 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy