FL H1357 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that public servant who fails to advertise, publicly announce, or electronically post solicitation for commodities or contractual services when required & under certain circumstances commits second degree felony.
Title
Public Procurement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00255 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00122 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1554 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0838 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |