FL H1357 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1594 (Ch. 2013-135)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1594 (Ch. 2013-135)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definitions; provides that contract may provide for repayments to lender of installation construction loan in installments for period not to exceed 20 years; requires contract to provide that repayments to lender of installation construction loan may be made over time, not to exceed 20 years from certain date; requires contract to provide for certain amount of repayment to lender of installation construction loan within 2 years after specified date; authorizes certain facility alterations to be included in performance contract & to be supervised by performance savings contractor; limits time allotted to Office of CFO to review & approve agency's guaranteed energy, water, & wastewater performance savings contract; requires that proposed contract include investment-grade audit certified by DMS.
Title
Guaranteed Energy, Water, & Wastewater Performance Savings Contracting Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1594 (Ch. 2013-135) |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 1594 |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-16 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-04-11 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/10/13, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-03-29 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-28 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-27 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1594 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-135