FL H1361 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits public school employees from using corporal punishment on public school student; defines "corporal punishment"; removes corporal punishment as option for teachers & other instructional personnel to use to manage student behavior.
Title
Corporal Punishment in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1120 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 3105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 2315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 1251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1361 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1361/BillText/Filed/PDF |