FL H1399 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to DOT; authorizes district secretaries & executive directors to be professional engineer from any state; amends provisions relating to payment of tax on fuel under specified provisions; removes provisions for Florida Seaport Transportation & Economic Development Council to develop freight-mobility & trade-corridor plans; requires M.P.O.'s to coordinate in development of regionally significant project priorities; adds military access facilities to types of facilities included in Strategic Intermodal System & Emerging Strategic Intermodal System which form components of interconnected transportation system; amends provisions relating to state pledge to bondholders; revises provisions for Orlando-Orange County Expressway Authority to construct & maintain Wekiva Parkway.
Title
Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1079 (Y: 97 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Transportation; Budget -SJ 858 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 97 NAYS 16 -HJ 1091 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1087 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1043 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-03-01 | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 993 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/12 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 907 | |
2012-02-27 | CS/CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 851 | |
2012-02-27 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-24 | CS/CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 4 -HJ 855 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/24/12, 8:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-16 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 682 | |
2012-02-15 | CS/CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 628 | |
2012-02-15 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-14 | CS/CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4 -HJ 633 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 11:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-09 | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 571 | |
2012-02-08 | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 545 | |
2012-02-08 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 550 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 3:35 pm, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 215 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 137 | |
2012-01-09 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
332 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
335 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
335 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
335 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
336 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
336 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 2275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 228 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 0805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 8225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 840 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
347 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 753 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7546 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 757 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 7645 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
349 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
349 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |