FL H1411 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Cites act as "Comprehensive Insurance Fraud Investigation and Prevention Act"; provides intent; revises provisions relating to crash reports; authorizes officer to testify at trial or provide affidavit; defines terms; revises requirements relating to form submitted by providers; revises provisions relating to payment; provides that time for paying or denying claim is tolled during investigation of fraudulent act; specifies when benefits are not payable; provides that claimant violating certain provisions is not entitled to payment, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Personal Injury Protection Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Albritton [R] | Rep. Debbie Boyd [D] | Rep. Mike Horner [R] | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
Rep. Ana Logan [R] | Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R] | Rep. Ronald Renuart [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-25 | PCS unfavorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 8 NAYS 9 | |
2011-04-24 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/25/11, 11:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-28 | Original reference(s) removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee | |
2011-03-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 -HJ 340 | |
2011-03-21 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 222 | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 734 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 737 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |