FL H1437 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases commissioner salaries; provides source for compensation; revises approval of foreign trade zones.
Title
Port of Palm Beach District, Palm Beach County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | Favorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2016-02-19 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-18 | House | CS by Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/18/16, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2016-02-01 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | House | Filed |