FL H1513 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates exemption from public records requirements for autopsy reports of minors whose deaths were related to acts of domestic violence; provides exception; requires that any viewing, copying, or handling of such autopsy reports be under direct supervision of custodian of records or his or her designee; requires that certain surviving parents of minor child whose death was related to domestic violence be given notice of petitions to view or copy minor child's autopsy report & of opportunity to be present & heard at related hearings; provides for retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records/Autopsy Reports of Child Victims of Domestic Violence
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Chuck Clemons [R] | Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. Alejandro Rizo [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#574 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-03 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-28 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1550 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability